U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cr-00113-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Anderson
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 11, 2025: [Order Adopting Findings and Recommendations]
  • April 11, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 11, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings - SDM]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: [Findings and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • March 27, 2025: [Consent to Plea before M/J - MT]
  • March 27, 2025: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • March 20, 2025: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • March 18, 2025: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
  • March 12, 2025: [Order Setting - MT]
  • March 12, 2025: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • March 12, 2025: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge - SDM]
  • March 11, 2025: [Change Plea - MT]
October, 2024
  • October 04, 2024: [Notice of Trial Days - MT]
  • October 01, 2024: [Notice of Discovery Request - MT]
  • October 01, 2024: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • October 01, 2024: [Notice of Defendant's Assertion of Fifth and Sixth Amendment Rights - MT]
  • October 01, 2024: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • October 01, 2024: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • October 01, 2024: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • October 01, 2024: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • October 01, 2024: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • October 01, 2024: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • October 01, 2024: [FTR Certification - MT]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.