U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 9:24-cr-00021-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Kozak
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2024
  • October 09, 2024: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • October 08, 2024: [Statement of Reasons]
  • October 08, 2024: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • October 08, 2024: [Judgment - SDM]
  • October 08, 2024: [Sentencing - SDM]
  • October 07, 2024: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • October 07, 2024: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • October 07, 2024: [Order Setting - MT]
  • October 04, 2024: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • October 04, 2024: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • October 03, 2024: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • October 03, 2024: [Extension of Time to File Document ]
  • October 01, 2024: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.