U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 9:24-cr-00048-2
  • Case Name: USA v. SpottedEagle et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Warrant Returned Executed]
March, 2025
  • March 24, 2025: [Order Setting - MT]
October, 2024
  • October 11, 2024: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • October 11, 2024: [Order]
  • October 03, 2024: [Order of Detention - SDM]
  • October 03, 2024: [Order Appointing Counsel - MT]
  • October 03, 2024: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • October 03, 2024: [Order Setting - MT]
  • October 03, 2024: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • October 03, 2024: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • October 03, 2024: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • October 03, 2024: [FTR Certification - MT]
  • October 02, 2024: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.