U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:23-cr-00140-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Seminole
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 05, 2025: [Amended Judgment]
  • May 05, 2025: [Amend/Correct ]
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • April 25, 2025: [Statement of Reasons]
  • April 25, 2025: [Judgment - SDM]
  • April 25, 2025: [Sentencing - SDM]
  • April 11, 2025: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
October, 2024
  • October 03, 2024: [Order Setting - MT]
  • October 02, 2024: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge - SDM]
  • October 02, 2024: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • October 02, 2024: [Change Plea - MT]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.