U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cr-00044-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Russell
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: [Statement of Reasons]
  • March 27, 2025: [Judgment - SDM]
  • March 27, 2025: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • March 27, 2025: [Sentencing - SDM]
  • March 24, 2025: [Remark - MT]
  • March 12, 2025: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • March 11, 2025: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
October, 2024
  • October 10, 2024: [Order on Motion for Detention Hearing - MT]
  • October 09, 2024: [Detention Hearing - MT]
  • October 08, 2024: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • October 08, 2024: [Dismiss ]
  • October 02, 2024: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • October 02, 2024: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • October 02, 2024: [Order Setting - MT]
  • October 02, 2024: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • October 02, 2024: [Continue ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.