U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 9:23-cr-00032-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Zornes
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 09, 2025: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • April 08, 2025: [Judgment - SDM]
  • April 08, 2025: [Statement of Reasons]
  • April 08, 2025: [Sentencing - SDM]
  • April 07, 2025: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • April 01, 2025: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
October, 2024
  • October 11, 2024: [Order Setting - MT]
  • October 11, 2024: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • October 10, 2024: [Change Plea - MT]
  • October 03, 2024: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • October 02, 2024: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • October 02, 2024: [FTR Certification - MT]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.