U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:24-cr-00072-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Runs Through, Jr. et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • April 24, 2025: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • April 21, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • April 17, 2025: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • April 17, 2025: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • April 16, 2025: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • April 16, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 16, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 16, 2025: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • April 16, 2025: [Statement of Reasons]
  • April 16, 2025: [Judgment - SDM]
  • April 16, 2025: [Sentencing - SDM]
  • April 01, 2025: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
November, 2024
  • November 16, 2024: [Continue ]
October, 2024
  • October 10, 2024: [Order of Detention - SDM]
  • October 10, 2024: [Detention Hearing]
  • October 09, 2024: [Order Setting Conditions of Release - SDM]
  • October 09, 2024: [Detention Hearing]
  • October 07, 2024: [Notice of Receipt of Discovery - MT]
  • October 03, 2024: [Order on Motion for Detention Hearing - MT]
  • October 03, 2024: [Detention Hearing - MT]
  • October 02, 2024: [Order on Motion for Detention Hearing - MT]
  • October 02, 2024: [Detention Hearing - MT]
  • October 02, 2024: [Notice of Receipt of Discovery - MT]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.