U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 6:24-cr-00010-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Madarassy
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: [Response to Motion]
  • April 25, 2025: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody ]
  • April 25, 2025: [Release from Custody ]
  • April 22, 2025: [Affidavit /Declaration - SDM]
March, 2025
  • March 18, 2025: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • March 18, 2025: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • March 18, 2025: [Forfeiture of Property ]
October, 2024
  • October 10, 2024: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • October 10, 2024: [Initial Appearance on Pretrial Release Violation]
  • October 10, 2024: [FTR Certification - MT]
  • October 09, 2024: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings - SDM]
  • October 03, 2024: [Order on Motion to Suppress ]
  • October 02, 2024: [Notice of Receipt of Discovery - MT]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.