U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cr-00140-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Hutzenbieler
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 08, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • April 07, 2025: [Continue ]
October, 2024
  • October 22, 2024: [Notice of Discovery Request - MT]
  • October 11, 2024: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings - SDM]
  • October 04, 2024: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued - MT]
  • October 04, 2024: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum ]
  • October 03, 2024: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • October 02, 2024: [Criminal Cover Sheet - MT]
  • October 02, 2024: [Indictment - Redacted - SDM]
  • October 02, 2024: [Indictment (Sealed)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.