U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:23-cr-00118-2
  • Case Name: USA v. Quam
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • April 25, 2025: [Statement of Reasons]
  • April 25, 2025: [Judgment - SDM]
  • April 25, 2025: [Affidavit /Declaration - SDM]
  • April 24, 2025: [1 - Applicable Party Document-use ONLY with other selection]
  • April 24, 2025: [Letter - MT]
  • April 24, 2025: [Sentencing - SDM]
  • April 23, 2025: [Sealed Document(s) Unredacted - MT]
  • April 23, 2025: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • April 14, 2025: [Sealed Document(s) Unredacted - MT]
  • April 11, 2025: [Evaluation Filed Under Seal - MT]
  • April 10, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • April 09, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Document ]
March, 2025
  • March 13, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • March 12, 2025: [Continue ]
October, 2024
  • October 02, 2024: [Order Adopting Findings and Recommendations]
  • October 02, 2024: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.