U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cr-00023-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Bullock et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [USCA Order]
  • April 18, 2025: [Notice of Correction (Text Only) - MT]
  • April 18, 2025: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment - SDM]
  • April 17, 2025: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • April 16, 2025: [Statement of Reasons]
  • April 16, 2025: [Judgment - SDM]
  • April 16, 2025: [Sentencing - SDM]
  • April 16, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • March 28, 2025: [Statement of Reasons]
  • March 28, 2025: [Judgment - SDM]
  • March 27, 2025: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • March 27, 2025: [Sentencing - SDM]
  • March 27, 2025: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • March 27, 2025: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • March 27, 2025: [Sealed Document(s) Unredacted - MT]
February, 2025
  • February 24, 2025: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
October, 2024
  • October 02, 2024: [Order Adopting Findings and Recommendations]
  • October 02, 2024: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.