U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 9:24-cr-00035-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Hawkins
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2025
  • January 24, 2025: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
October, 2024
  • October 10, 2024: [Order Setting - MT]
  • October 09, 2024: [Findings and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • October 09, 2024: [Consent to Plea before M/J - MT]
  • October 09, 2024: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • October 09, 2024: [FTR Certification - MT]
  • October 09, 2024: [Order Setting - MT]
  • October 08, 2024: [Order Referring Motion]
  • October 08, 2024: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • October 02, 2024: [Offer of Proof - MT]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.