U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:23-cr-00063-1
  • Case Name: USA v. American Horse
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 10, 2025: [Order Setting - MT]
  • April 10, 2025: [Order]
  • April 10, 2025: [Exhibits - MT]
  • April 10, 2025: [Remark L.R. 5.1 Exhibits]
  • April 09, 2025: [Jury Verdict - Redacted -MT]
  • April 09, 2025: [Jury Verdict - Unredacted - SDM]
  • April 09, 2025: [Jury Notes ]
  • April 09, 2025: [JERS Electronic List]
  • April 09, 2025: [Exhibit List ]
  • April 09, 2025: [Witness List - SDM]
  • April 09, 2025: [Jury Instructions ]
  • April 08, 2025: [Jury Instructions ]
  • April 08, 2025: [Jury List]
  • April 08, 2025: [Jury Trial]
  • April 08, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings - SDM]
  • April 08, 2025: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • April 04, 2025: [Order Setting - MT]
  • April 01, 2025: [Exhibit List ]
  • April 01, 2025: [Proposed Verdict Form - MT]
  • April 01, 2025: [Proposed Jury Instructions - SDM]
  • April 01, 2025: [Proposed Voir Dire]
  • April 01, 2025: [Trial Brief ]
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: [Notice of Receipt of Discovery - MT]
  • March 26, 2025: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • March 25, 2025: [Notice of Intent to Proceed to Trial - MT]
  • March 20, 2025: [Notice of Receipt of Discovery - MT]
February, 2025
  • February 23, 2025: [Sealed Document(s) Unredacted - MT]
  • February 11, 2025: [Notice of Intent to Proceed to Trial - MT]
October, 2024
  • October 02, 2024: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • October 02, 2024: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • October 02, 2024: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings - SDM]
  • October 02, 2024: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • October 02, 2024: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • October 02, 2024: [Continue ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.