U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 9:24-cr-00011-2
  • Case Name: USA v. Turcotte et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • April 24, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • April 23, 2025: [Continue ]
  • April 22, 2025: [Response to Motion]
  • April 21, 2025: [Response to Motion]
  • April 21, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • April 21, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • April 18, 2025: [Continue ]
  • April 18, 2025: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • April 18, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • April 18, 2025: [Judgment Returned Executed ]
  • April 15, 2025: [Judgment Returned Executed ]
  • April 07, 2025: [Notice of Filing Exhibits - MT]
  • April 07, 2025: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • April 07, 2025: [Order Setting Hearing on Motion - MT]
  • April 04, 2025: [Sealed Document(s) Unredacted - MT]
  • April 04, 2025: [Suppress ]
  • April 04, 2025: [Produce ]
  • April 04, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 04, 2025: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • April 04, 2025: [In Limine ]
  • April 04, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
October, 2024
  • October 11, 2024: [Order]
  • October 11, 2024: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • October 11, 2024: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • October 11, 2024: [Continue ]
  • October 11, 2024: [Order Setting Conditions of Release - SDM]
  • October 11, 2024: [Detention Hearing]
  • October 11, 2024: [FTR Certification - MT]
  • October 09, 2024: [Order on Motion for Detention Hearing - MT]
  • October 09, 2024: [Detention Hearing - MT]
  • October 08, 2024: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • October 02, 2024: [Order Setting - MT]
  • October 02, 2024: [Consent to Plea before M/J - MT]
  • October 02, 2024: [Findings and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • October 02, 2024: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • October 02, 2024: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • October 02, 2024: [FTR Certification - MT]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.