U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 6:24-cr-00003-3
  • Case Name: USA v. Herendeen et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Judgment Returned Executed ]
December, 2024
  • December 23, 2024: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • December 11, 2024: [Notice of Filing Exhibits - MT]
October, 2024
  • October 03, 2024: [GLACIER Court Proceedings]
  • October 03, 2024: [FTR Certification - MT]
  • October 02, 2024: [Order Setting - MT]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.