U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cr-00040-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Hamblin
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 18, 2025: [USCA Case Number]
  • April 17, 2025: [Notice of Appeal - Order - MT]
  • April 04, 2025: [Statement of Reasons]
  • April 04, 2025: [Judgment - SDM]
  • April 04, 2025: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • April 04, 2025: [Sentencing - SDM]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 21, 2025: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
October, 2024
  • October 02, 2024: [Motion Hearing]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.