U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 9:11-cr-00005-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Skelton
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Personal Identifier Page - MT]
  • March 28, 2025: [Judgment on Revocation of SRT - MT]
  • March 27, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 24, 2025: [Personal Identifier Page - MT]
  • March 24, 2025: [Judgment on Revocation of SRT - MT]
  • March 24, 2025: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing - SDM]
  • March 12, 2025: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel and Entry of Appearance - MT]
  • March 12, 2025: [Order of Detention - SDM]
  • March 12, 2025: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • March 12, 2025: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
October, 2024
  • October 08, 2024: [Order Setting - MT]
  • October 08, 2024: [Order of Detention - SDM]
  • October 07, 2024: [Notice of Defendant's Assertion of Fifth and Sixth Amendment Rights - MT]
  • October 07, 2024: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • October 07, 2024: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • October 07, 2024: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • October 07, 2024: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • October 07, 2024: [FTR Certification - MT]
  • October 04, 2024: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel and Entry of Appearance - MT]
  • October 03, 2024: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.