U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:24-cr-00079-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Redd, et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 05, 2025: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • May 05, 2025: [Dismiss ]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • April 29, 2025: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • April 29, 2025: [Continue ]
  • April 22, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • April 21, 2025: [Notice of Receipt of Discovery - MT]
  • April 18, 2025: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • April 18, 2025: [Continue ]
  • April 10, 2025: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • April 10, 2025: [FTR Certification - MT]
  • April 10, 2025: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • April 10, 2025: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • April 04, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • April 04, 2025: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • April 04, 2025: [Continue ]
March, 2025
  • March 25, 2025: [Order Setting - MT]
  • March 17, 2025: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • March 17, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 17, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings - SDM]
  • March 17, 2025: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • March 13, 2025: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • March 13, 2025: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • March 12, 2025: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • March 12, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
February, 2025
  • February 13, 2025: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
October, 2024
  • October 16, 2024: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • October 11, 2024: [Set/Reset Hearings (email USMS/USPO)]
  • October 10, 2024: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • October 10, 2024: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • October 10, 2024: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • October 10, 2024: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • October 10, 2024: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • October 10, 2024: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • October 10, 2024: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • October 10, 2024: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • October 09, 2024: [Set/Reset Hearings (email USMS/USPO)]
  • October 03, 2024: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • October 03, 2024: [Order Appointing Counsel - MT]
  • October 03, 2024: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • October 03, 2024: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • October 03, 2024: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • October 03, 2024: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • October 03, 2024: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • October 03, 2024: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • October 03, 2024: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.