U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cr-00104-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Wipf
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2025
  • March 18, 2025: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • March 18, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • March 18, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion - SDM]
  • March 18, 2025: [Continue ]
  • March 18, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document - SDM]
  • March 17, 2025: [Leave to File Document ]
February, 2025
  • February 27, 2025: [Detention Hearing]
  • February 07, 2025: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
October, 2024
  • October 11, 2024: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • October 07, 2024: [Notice of Discovery Request - MT]
  • October 07, 2024: [Notice of Trial Days - MT]
  • October 04, 2024: [Notice of Defendant's Assertion of Fifth and Sixth Amendment Rights - MT]
  • October 04, 2024: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • October 04, 2024: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • October 04, 2024: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • October 04, 2024: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • October 04, 2024: [FTR Certification - MT]
  • October 04, 2024: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • October 04, 2024: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • October 04, 2024: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • October 03, 2024: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.