U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cr-00068-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Garner et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Order Adopting Findings and Recommendations]
  • March 28, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • March 28, 2025: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • March 13, 2025: [Findings and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • March 13, 2025: [Consent to Plea before M/J - MT]
  • March 13, 2025: [FTR Certification - MT]
  • March 13, 2025: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • March 11, 2025: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
  • March 10, 2025: [Offer of Proof - MT]
December, 2024
  • December 02, 2024: [Continue ]
October, 2024
  • October 08, 2024: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • October 07, 2024: [Continue ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.