U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cr-00005-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Cochran
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 04, 2025: [Notice of Filing Exhibits - MT]
  • May 04, 2025: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • May 02, 2025: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • May 01, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Document ]
  • April 02, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • April 01, 2025: [Continue ]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Letter - MT]
  • March 28, 2025: [Affidavit /Declaration - SDM]
October, 2024
  • October 08, 2024: [Order Setting - MT]
  • October 08, 2024: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • October 08, 2024: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge - SDM]
  • October 07, 2024: [Change Plea - MT]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.