U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:23-cr-00127-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Wright et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 01, 2025: [USCA Case Number]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Response - MT]
  • April 30, 2025: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment - SDM]
  • April 30, 2025: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • April 30, 2025: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • April 29, 2025: [Statement of Reasons]
  • April 29, 2025: [Judgment - SDM]
  • April 29, 2025: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • April 29, 2025: [Sentencing - SDM]
  • April 29, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 23, 2025: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • April 09, 2025: [Order Setting - MT]
October, 2024
  • October 09, 2024: [Order]
  • October 09, 2024: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • October 08, 2024: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • October 08, 2024: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • October 08, 2024: [Order Setting - MT]
  • October 07, 2024: [Change Plea - MT]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.