U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cr-00067-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Dunwald
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 17, 2025: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • April 17, 2025: [Statement of Reasons]
  • April 17, 2025: [Judgment - SDM]
  • April 16, 2025: [Sentencing - SDM]
  • April 07, 2025: [Notice of Filing Exhibits - MT]
  • April 03, 2025: [Notice of Filing Exhibits - MT]
  • April 02, 2025: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
October, 2024
  • October 07, 2024: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • October 07, 2024: [Continue ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.