U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 9:24-cr-00056-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Skelton
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Personal Identifier Page - MT]
  • March 28, 2025: [Judgment on Revocation of SRT - MT]
  • March 28, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 27, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 24, 2025: [Personal Identifier Page - MT]
  • March 24, 2025: [Judgment on Revocation of SRT - MT]
  • March 24, 2025: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing - SDM]
  • March 12, 2025: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel and Entry of Appearance - MT]
  • March 12, 2025: [Order of Detention - SDM]
  • March 12, 2025: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • March 12, 2025: [Order Setting - MT]
  • March 12, 2025: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • March 12, 2025: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • March 12, 2025: [FTR Certification - MT]
  • March 12, 2025: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings - SDM]
  • March 12, 2025: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
October, 2024
  • October 07, 2024: [Transfer In/Supervised Release]
  • October 07, 2024: [Transfer of Jurisdiction (Preliminary) - MT]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.