U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:24-cr-00049-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Welch
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 07, 2025: [Order Setting - MT]
March, 2025
  • March 25, 2025: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • March 25, 2025: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • March 25, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings - SDM]
  • March 25, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 20, 2025: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
  • March 18, 2025: [Order Setting Hearing on Motion - MT]
  • March 18, 2025: [Order Vacating - MT]
  • March 17, 2025: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • March 17, 2025: [Order Setting Hearing on Motion - MT]
  • March 17, 2025: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • March 17, 2025: [Change Plea - MT]
October, 2024
  • October 10, 2024: [Order Setting - MT]
  • October 10, 2024: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • October 09, 2024: [Hearing ]
  • October 08, 2024: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • October 08, 2024: [Continue ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.