U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:23-cv-00137
  • Case Name: Lindstrom v. Polaris, Inc. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 23, 2025: [Order]
  • April 23, 2025: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings - SDM]
  • April 18, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
March, 2025
  • March 11, 2025: [Protective Order]
  • March 11, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
October, 2024
  • October 11, 2024: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • October 09, 2024: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • October 09, 2024: [Appoint Counsel]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.