U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:24-cr-00074-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Cuts The Rope
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 10, 2025: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • April 10, 2025: [Statement of Reasons]
  • April 10, 2025: [Judgment - SDM]
  • April 10, 2025: [Sentencing - SDM]
  • April 07, 2025: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • April 02, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 02, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 02, 2025: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • March 26, 2025: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • March 26, 2025: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • March 26, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 26, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 12, 2025: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
October, 2024
  • October 10, 2024: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • October 10, 2024: [Notice of Discovery Request - MT]
  • October 09, 2024: [Notice of Defendant's Assertion of Fifth and Sixth Amendment Rights - MT]
  • October 09, 2024: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • October 09, 2024: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • October 09, 2024: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • October 09, 2024: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • October 09, 2024: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • October 09, 2024: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • October 09, 2024: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.