U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:24-cr-00081-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Kipp
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 15, 2025: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • April 15, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 14, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 09, 2025: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • April 09, 2025: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • April 08, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • April 08, 2025: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
October, 2024
  • October 17, 2024: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • October 10, 2024: [Scheduling Order - SDM]
  • October 09, 2024: [Notice of Discovery Request - MT]
  • October 09, 2024: [Order Setting Conditions of Release - SDM]
  • October 09, 2024: [Notice of Defendant's Assertion of Fifth and Sixth Amendment Rights - MT]
  • October 09, 2024: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • October 09, 2024: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • October 09, 2024: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • October 09, 2024: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • October 09, 2024: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • October 09, 2024: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • October 09, 2024: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.