U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:24-cr-00046-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Bernard et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 24, 2025: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • April 21, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • April 17, 2025: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • April 17, 2025: [Order Setting - MT]
  • April 16, 2025: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • April 16, 2025: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • April 16, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Order Setting Hearing on Motion - MT]
  • March 31, 2025: [Order Vacating - MT]
  • March 24, 2025: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • March 20, 2025: [Amended Judgment]
  • March 19, 2025: [Statement of Reasons]
  • March 19, 2025: [Judgment - SDM]
  • March 19, 2025: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • March 19, 2025: [Sentencing - SDM]
  • March 19, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • March 12, 2025: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • March 10, 2025: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
October, 2024
  • October 11, 2024: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • October 11, 2024: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • October 11, 2024: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings - SDM]
  • October 10, 2024: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • October 10, 2024: [Continue ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.