U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:24-cr-00029-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Montenegro-Virrey
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 09, 2025: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • April 09, 2025: [Statement of Reasons]
  • April 09, 2025: [Judgment - SDM]
  • April 09, 2025: [Sentencing - SDM]
  • April 02, 2025: [Response - MT]
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
October, 2024
  • October 31, 2024: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 10, 2024: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 10, 2024: [Miscellaneous Relief]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.