U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:23-cr-00008-2
  • Case Name: USA v. Lorenzo, et al.
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 24, 2025: [Affidavit /Declaration - SDM]
March, 2025
  • March 20, 2025: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • March 19, 2025: [Judgment Restitution Payee Information - MT]
  • March 19, 2025: [Statement of Reasons]
  • March 19, 2025: [Judgment - SDM]
  • March 19, 2025: [Sentencing - SDM]
  • March 19, 2025: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • March 18, 2025: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • March 18, 2025: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • March 14, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document - SDM]
  • March 14, 2025: [Leave to File Document ]
October, 2024
  • October 11, 2024: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • October 10, 2024: [Continue ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.