U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:24-cr-00028-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Brancamp
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 15, 2025: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • April 11, 2025: [Amended Judgment]
  • April 10, 2025: [Statement of Reasons]
  • April 10, 2025: [Judgment - SDM]
  • April 10, 2025: [Sentencing - SDM]
  • April 02, 2025: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
October, 2024
  • October 11, 2024: [Order of Detention - SDM]
  • October 11, 2024: [Order Setting - MT]
  • October 11, 2024: [Notice of Defendant's Assertion of Fifth and Sixth Amendment Rights - MT]
  • October 11, 2024: [Order Appointing Public Defender - SDM]
  • October 11, 2024: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • October 11, 2024: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • October 11, 2024: [Arraignment - SDM]
  • October 11, 2024: [Initial Appearance SDM]
  • October 11, 2024: [FTR Certification - MT]
  • October 11, 2024: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.