U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 6:23-cr-00012-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Walid
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
February, 2025
  • February 04, 2025: [Notice of Filing Exhibits - MT]
January, 2025
  • January 23, 2025: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings - SDM]
  • January 21, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings - SDM]
  • January 20, 2025: [Proposed Jury Instructions - SDM]
  • January 14, 2025: [Proposed Verdict Form - MT]
December, 2024
  • December 23, 2024: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
October, 2024
  • October 11, 2024: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • October 11, 2024: [Continue ]
  • October 11, 2024: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • October 11, 2024: [Miscellaneous Relief]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.