U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cr-00074-4
  • Case Name: USA v. Ortiz-Osorio et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • April 24, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear]
  • April 24, 2025: [Appear]
  • April 24, 2025: [Continue ]
  • April 17, 2025: [Summons Issued]
  • April 17, 2025: [Order on Motion for Summons]
  • April 16, 2025: [Summons]
January, 2025
  • January 27, 2025: [Continue ]
October, 2024
  • October 28, 2024: [Continue ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.