U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:23-cr-00109-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Heafner
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2025
  • March 18, 2025: [Order Setting - MT]
  • March 18, 2025: [Jury List]
  • March 18, 2025: [Jury Instructions ]
  • March 18, 2025: [Jury Notes ]
  • March 18, 2025: [1 - Applicable Party Document-use ONLY with other selection]
  • March 18, 2025: [Docket Annotation]
  • March 18, 2025: [Exhibits - MT]
  • March 18, 2025: [Exhibit List ]
  • March 18, 2025: [Witness List - SDM]
  • March 18, 2025: [Jury Verdict - Redacted -MT]
  • March 18, 2025: [Jury Verdict - Unredacted - SDM]
  • March 17, 2025: [Order]
  • March 17, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • March 17, 2025: [Jury Trial]
  • March 17, 2025: [Stipulation - MT]
  • March 17, 2025: [Proposed Jury Instructions - SDM]
  • March 17, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Under Seal - SDM]
  • March 14, 2025: [Leave to File Under Seal - SDM]
  • March 14, 2025: [Exhibit List ]
  • March 14, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 11, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
November, 2024
  • November 01, 2024: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.