U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cr-00110-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Wallowing Bull
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Order Appointing Counsel - MT]
  • April 28, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 28, 2025: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys - SDM]
  • April 25, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • April 24, 2025: [Continue ]
  • April 21, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • April 21, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Document ]
  • April 18, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
November, 2024
  • November 08, 2024: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.