U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cr-00086-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Muzzana
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • April 22, 2025: [FTR Certification - MT]
  • April 22, 2025: [Motion Hearing]
  • April 17, 2025: [Order Setting Hearing on Motion - MT]
  • April 17, 2025: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • April 17, 2025: [Response to Motion]
  • April 16, 2025: [Travel ]
November, 2024
  • November 13, 2024: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.