U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 9:24-cr-00062-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Holcomb
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 02, 2025: [Order of Detention - SDM]
  • May 01, 2025: [Detention Hearing]
  • May 01, 2025: [FTR Certification - MT]
  • May 01, 2025: [Notice of Filing Exhibits - MT]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • April 29, 2025: [Continue ]
  • April 29, 2025: [Order Setting - MT]
  • April 23, 2025: [Detention Hearing - MT]
  • April 15, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • April 14, 2025: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • April 14, 2025: [Continue ]
  • April 14, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • April 11, 2025: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • April 11, 2025: [Continue ]
March, 2025
  • March 20, 2025: [Order of Detention - SDM]
  • March 19, 2025: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • March 19, 2025: [Order - Due Process Protection Act - MT]
  • March 19, 2025: [Initial Appearance on Pretrial Release Violation]
  • March 19, 2025: [FTR Certification - MT]
  • March 19, 2025: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings - SDM]
November, 2024
  • November 18, 2024: [Order Setting - MT]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.