U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cr-00128-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Blakely
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 02, 2025: [Administrative Correction - MT]
  • May 01, 2025: [Order Setting - MT]
  • May 01, 2025: [Findings and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • May 01, 2025: [Consent to Plea before M/J - MT]
  • May 01, 2025: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • May 01, 2025: [FTR Certification - MT]
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • April 11, 2025: [Order Setting - MT]
  • April 11, 2025: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge - SDM]
  • April 11, 2025: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • April 10, 2025: [Change Plea - MT]
  • April 08, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • April 07, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Document ]
January, 2025
  • January 06, 2025: [Continue ]
November, 2024
  • November 21, 2024: [Detention Hearing - MT]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.