U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cr-00098-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Medina et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Affidavit /Declaration - SDM]
  • April 17, 2025: [Statement of Reasons]
  • April 17, 2025: [Judgment - SDM]
  • April 16, 2025: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • April 16, 2025: [Sentencing - SDM]
  • April 14, 2025: [Notice of Filing Exhibits - MT]
  • April 10, 2025: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • April 10, 2025: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • April 10, 2025: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • April 08, 2025: [Order Setting - MT]
  • April 08, 2025: [Order Setting Conditions of Release - SDM]
  • April 08, 2025: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • April 08, 2025: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • April 08, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 07, 2025: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
  • April 07, 2025: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • April 04, 2025: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • April 01, 2025: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • April 01, 2025: [Order Setting - MT]
  • April 01, 2025: [Change Plea - MT]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • March 28, 2025: [Continue ]
  • March 26, 2025: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • March 26, 2025: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • March 26, 2025: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • March 19, 2025: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
November, 2024
  • November 25, 2024: [Offer of Proof - MT]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.