U.S. Civil Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:24-cv-00002
  • Case Name: Hanover Insurance Company v. Bozeman Real Estate Group et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 23, 2025: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
  • April 23, 2025: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • April 22, 2025: [Motion Hearing - SDM]
  • April 15, 2025: [Affidavit/Declaration - SDM]
  • April 15, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • April 07, 2025: [Order Setting Hearing on Motion - SDM]
  • April 01, 2025: [Affidavit/Declaration - SDM]
  • April 01, 2025: [Response to Motion]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • March 31, 2025: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • March 31, 2025: [Dismiss - SDM]
February, 2025
  • February 06, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
January, 2025
  • January 27, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
November, 2024
  • November 25, 2024: [Leave to File Document]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.