U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cr-00075-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Snow
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 03, 2025: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • April 03, 2025: [Sentencing - SDM]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Evaluation Filed Under Seal - MT]
  • March 28, 2025: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • March 27, 2025: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • March 21, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • March 21, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Document ]
  • March 17, 2025: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • March 12, 2025: [Dismiss ]
November, 2024
  • November 29, 2024: [Offer of Proof - MT]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.