U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 9:24-bk-90235-
  • Case Name: TONYA YVONNE THOMAS and TIMOTHY MICHAEL THOMAS, Sr
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 27, 2025: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order for Relief from Stay]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [Modify Stay (Fee Paid)]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [Motion to Modify Stay (Fee Paid)]
January, 2025
  • January 21, 2025: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [Motion for Approval of Reaffirmation Agreement]
December, 2024
  • December 01, 2024: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
November, 2024
  • November 29, 2024: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: CRUM, DARCY M. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset (Individual/Joint)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.