U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:24-cr-00033-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Standingrock
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 02, 2025: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • May 02, 2025: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
  • May 02, 2025: [Forfeiture of Property ]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Notice (Other) - SDM]
  • April 30, 2025: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • April 02, 2025: [Affidavit /Declaration - SDM]
March, 2025
  • March 11, 2025: [Order Setting - MT]
  • March 11, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 11, 2025: [Continue ]
December, 2024
  • December 03, 2024: [Order Setting - MT]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.