U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 9:24-cr-00067-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Slattery et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • April 24, 2025: [Order Setting - MT]
  • April 24, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 23, 2025: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
  • April 23, 2025: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • April 23, 2025: [Order Referring Motion]
  • April 23, 2025: [Change Plea - MT]
  • April 09, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 09, 2025: [Order Setting - MT]
March, 2025
  • March 18, 2025: [Motion Hearing]
January, 2025
  • January 21, 2025: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings - SDM]
December, 2024
  • December 06, 2024: [Indictment (Sealed)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.