U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:24-cr-00035-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Brock
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 01, 2025: [Order Setting - MT]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Findings and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • April 30, 2025: [Consent to Plea before M/J - MT]
  • April 30, 2025: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • April 25, 2025: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • April 04, 2025: [Order Setting - MT]
  • April 02, 2025: [Order Referring Motion]
  • April 02, 2025: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • April 02, 2025: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
  • April 02, 2025: [Change Plea - MT]
March, 2025
  • March 17, 2025: [Order Setting - MT]
  • March 17, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
December, 2024
  • December 17, 2024: [Order Setting Conditions of Release - SDM]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.