U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 6:24-cr-00012-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Knudson et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 02, 2025: [Continue ]
April, 2025
  • April 22, 2025: [Order Setting - MT]
  • April 22, 2025: [Order Vacating - MT]
  • April 21, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • April 18, 2025: [Amended Document (NOT Motion) - MT]
  • April 18, 2025: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • April 15, 2025: [Notice of Filing Exhibits - MT]
  • April 15, 2025: [Sentencing Memorandum ]
  • April 09, 2025: [Notice of Filing Exhibits - MT]
December, 2024
  • December 18, 2024: [~Util - Plea Entered]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.