U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 9:24-bk-90246-
  • Case Name: TRICON COMMERCIAL CONSTRUCTION LLC
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Transcript]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Hearing Terminated - Text Only]
March, 2025
  • March 13, 2025: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Setting Hearing]
  • March 13, 2025: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Order (Generic)]
  • March 13, 2025: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Minutes of Hearing Held]
  • March 11, 2025: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Order Setting Hearing]
  • March 10, 2025: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Generic Motion - BK]
February, 2025
  • February 22, 2025: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order on Motion to Extend Time]
  • February 19, 2025: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Motion to Extend Time - BK]
  • February 15, 2025: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order (Generic)]
  • February 10, 2025: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Order Setting Hearing]
  • February 05, 2025: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Reply/Response to Motion (Hearing Required)]
  • February 04, 2025: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Employ]
  • February 03, 2025: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Notice To File Proofs of Claim]
January, 2025
  • January 31, 2025: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Response to Motion]
  • January 17, 2025: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Reply/Response to Motion (Hearing Required)]
  • January 10, 2025: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Motion to Extend Deadline to File Schedules]
  • January 06, 2025: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Motion to Extend Deadline to File Schedules]
  • January 03, 2025: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [Generic Motion - BK]
December, 2024
  • December 19, 2024: bk Office: 9 Chapter: 7 Trustee: SAMSON, RICHARD J. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - All Chapter Deficiency Notice]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.