U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cr-00144-2
  • Case Name: USA v. Garrett et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 24, 2025: [Order Adopting Findings and Recommendations]
  • April 24, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 24, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • April 23, 2025: [Findings and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • April 23, 2025: [FTR Certification - MT]
  • April 23, 2025: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • April 23, 2025: [Consent to Plea before M/J - MT]
  • April 15, 2025: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • April 09, 2025: [FTR Certification - MT]
  • April 09, 2025: [Findings and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • April 09, 2025: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • April 09, 2025: [Consent to Plea before M/J - MT]
  • April 09, 2025: [Order Setting - MT]
  • April 08, 2025: [Order]
  • April 08, 2025: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • April 08, 2025: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
  • April 07, 2025: [Offer of Proof - MT]
  • April 07, 2025: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
  • April 07, 2025: [Order Setting - MT]
  • April 07, 2025: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge - SDM]
  • April 07, 2025: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • April 07, 2025: [Change Plea - MT]
December, 2024
  • December 21, 2024: [Notice of Defendant's Assertion of Fifth and Sixth Amendment Rights - MT]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.