U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District Of Montana

montana Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District Of Montana
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:24-cr-00060-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Nava
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 15, 2025: [Order Setting - MT]
  • April 15, 2025: [Change of Plea Hearing - SDM]
  • April 15, 2025: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • April 15, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 09, 2025: [Order]
  • April 09, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings - SDM]
  • April 09, 2025: [Hearing]
  • April 08, 2025: [Offer of Proof - MT]
March, 2025
  • March 25, 2025: [Plea Agreement - SDM]
  • March 21, 2025: [Order Setting - MT]
  • March 21, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 21, 2025: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • March 20, 2025: [Change Plea - MT]
  • March 10, 2025: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings - SDM]
  • March 10, 2025: [Order Setting Hearing on Motion - MT]
  • March 10, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
December, 2024
  • December 31, 2024: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Under Seal - SDM]
  • December 30, 2024: [Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.